ID S1039 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Session Law Chapter 37 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

IDAHO WOLF DEPREDATION CONTROL BOARD -- Amends and repeals existing law to remove a sunset date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and repeals existing law to remove a sunset date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateSession Law Chapter 37 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-02-22SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-02-21HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-02-20SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-02-19SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-02-18Houseto Senate
2019-02-18HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-18HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 51-19-0
2019-02-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-08HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-02-08HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-07Senateto House
2019-02-07SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-07SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 30-5-0
2019-02-06SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-05SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-31SenateReported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback