ID S1023 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 235 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ASSAULT AND BATTERY -- Amends existing law to provide for certain employees of the Department of Parks and Recreation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for certain employees of the Department of Parks and Recreation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateSession Law Chapter 235 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-27SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-26HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-25SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-22SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-21Houseto Senate
2019-03-21HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-21HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 37-28-5
2019-03-20HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-19HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-18HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-07HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2019-02-07HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-06Senateto House
2019-02-06SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-06SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 22-13-0
2019-02-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-01-31SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-23SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback