ID S1018 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Signed by Governor on 03/04/15 Session Law Chapter 23 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION - Amends existing law relating to certificate records and fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law relating to certificate records and fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-04SenateSigned by Governor on 03/04/15 Session Law Chapter 23 Effective: 07/01/2015
2015-03-02SenateReported delivered to Governor on 02/27/15
2015-02-27SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2015-02-26HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2015-02-25SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2015-02-24SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2015-02-23Houseto Senate
2015-02-23HouseTitle apvd
2015-02-23HousePASSED -- 68-1-1
2015-02-23HouseRead Third Time in Full
2015-02-20HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 23, 2015
2015-02-20HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 23, 2015
2015-02-19HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2015-02-18HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2015-02-17HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2015-02-09HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2015-02-09HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2015-02-06Senateto House
2015-02-06SenateTitle apvd
2015-02-06SenatePASSED -- 34-0-1
2015-02-06SenateRead third time in full
2015-02-05SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2015-02-04SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2015-01-29SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2015-01-28SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback