ID S1013 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - U.C. to be returned to Commerce & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - U.C. to be returned to Commerce & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COMMERCIAL TRANSACTIONS -- Amends existing law to revise the regulations and requirements regarding commercial transactions.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the regulations and requirements regarding commercial transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | U.C. to be returned to Commerce & Human Resources Committee |
2021-04-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 26, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 19, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 12, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-09 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Business |
2021-02-09 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-02-08 | Senate | to House |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 20-13-2 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |