ID HR005 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HOUSE RULE 58 -- Stating findings of the House of Representatives and providing for the amendment of Rule 58 of the Rules of the House of Representatives.
Title
Stating findings of the House of Representatives and providing for the amendment of Rule 58 of the Rules of the House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2018-02-22 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 65-0-4 |
2018-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |