ID HJR004 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:16 a.m. on March 10, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:16 a.m. on March 10, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATURE -- Proposing an amendment to the Idaho Constitution to set the number of legislative districts at 35 and to set the number of state senators at 35.
Title
Proposing an amendment to the Idaho Constitution to set the number of legislative districts at 35 and to set the number of state senators at 35.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:16 a.m. on March 10, 2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-04 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read third time in full -- ADOPTED 31-4-0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-18 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-18 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-18 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 65-3-2 |
2020-02-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-02-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |