ID HJM006 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:28 p.m. on March 19, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:28 p.m. on March 19, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services to suspend the imposition of the PPACA taxes on the healthcare industry and to conduct a national review of the impact of these taxes until such time as a clear understanding of their impact can be determined.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services to suspend the imposition of the PPACA taxes on the healthcare industry and to conduct a national review of the impact of these taxes until such time as a clear understanding of their impact can be determined.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:28 p.m. on March 19, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2014-03-19 | House | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-19 | House | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-17 | House | to House |
2014-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-17 | House | Martin |
2014-03-17 | House | 28-7-0 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Tucker(Hagedorn), Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Siddoway, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Winder NAYS -- Bock, Buckner-Webb, Lacey, Schmidt, Stennett, Ward-Engelking, Werk Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-17 | House | ADOPTED |
2014-03-17 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-17 | House | Motion to reconsider |
2014-03-14 | House | Held for reconsideration |
2014-03-14 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-14 | Senate | ADOPTED -- 27-6-2 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read in full |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-02-24 | House | to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | Title apvd |
2014-02-24 | House | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2014-02-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 24, 2014 |
2014-02-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-19 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-12 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |