ID HJM005 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:48 a.m. on March 19, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:48 a.m. on March 19, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BOULDER-WHITE CLOUDS MONUMENT - Stating findings of the Legislature and declaring that any efforts to reach decisions regarding national monument designation in the Boulder-White Clouds area of Central Idaho should be made with local collaboration, rather than by unilateral federal administrative processes that exclude the residents of Idaho.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and declaring that any efforts to reach decisions regarding national monument designation in the Boulder-White Clouds area of Central Idaho should be made with local collaboration, rather than by unilateral federal administrative processes that exclude the residents of Idaho.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:48 a.m. on March 19, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-17 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-16 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-13 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-13 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Read in full |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-03-05 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-05 | House | ADOPTED -- 64-0-6 |
2015-03-05 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-02-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |