ID HJM003 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:51 a.m. on March 21, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:51 a.m. on March 21, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FEDERAL FACILITY AGREEMENT AND CONSENT ORDER -- Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring the 25th anniversary of the signing of the Federal Facility Agreement and Consent Order and to supporting Congress to identify commit and sustain the necessary funding to allow the Department of Energy to continue to make progress at meeting its cleanup milestones to benefit the citizens of Idaho and their environment.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring the 25th anniversary of the signing of the Federal Facility Agreement and Consent Order and to supporting Congress to identify commit and sustain the necessary funding to allow the Department of Energy to continue to make progress at meeting its cleanup milestones to benefit the citizens of Idaho and their environment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:51 a.m. on March 21, 2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-14 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-06 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 6, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/HJM003/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/HJM003.pdf |