ID HCR058 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:24 a.m. on March 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:24 a.m. on March 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SHEILA OLSEN -- Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring Sheila Olsen for her commitment and contributions to the people and the State of Idaho.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring Sheila Olsen for her commitment and contributions to the people and the State of Idaho.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:24 a.m. on March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-03-13 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 68 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 2, read in full as required -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2018-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-12 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/HCR058/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/HCR058.pdf |