ID HCR054 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:50 a.m. on March 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

JERRY KRAMER -- Stating findings of the Legislature and congratulating Jerry Kramer on his induction into the Pro Football Hall of Fame.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and congratulating Jerry Kramer on his induction into the Pro Football Hall of Fame.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 10:50 a.m. on March 16, 2018
2018-03-16HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-03-15SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-15SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-14HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-14HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-13Senateto House
2018-03-13SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-13SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-12SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-03-06SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-03-06SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-05Houseto Senate
2018-03-05HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-05HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-02HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-01HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback