ID HCR051 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:28 p.m. on March 19, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:28 p.m. on March 19, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and commemorating and honoring the contributions of Idaho veterans of the armed forces who served in Vietnam, and encouraging the people of the State of Idaho to observe "Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day" with ceremonies and activities that promote awareness of the contributions of our Vietnam War veterans and the importance of helping Idaho Vietnam veterans readjust to civilian life.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and commemorating and honoring the contributions of Idaho veterans of the armed forces who served in Vietnam, and encouraging the people of the State of Idaho to observe "Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day" with ceremonies and activities that promote awareness of the contributions of our Vietnam War veterans and the importance of helping Idaho Vietnam veterans readjust to civilian life.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:28 p.m. on March 19, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-18 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-18 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read in full |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-03-05 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-05 | House | Boyle & Holtzclaw |
2014-03-05 | House | voice vote Floor Sponsors |
2014-03-05 | House | ADOPTED |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 59 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 11, read three times |
2014-03-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/HCR051.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/HCR051.pdf |