ID HCR046 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:38 a.m. on March 24, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:38 a.m. on March 24, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
U.S. CAPITOL CHRISTMAS TREE - Stating findings of the Legislature and urging Idahoans to participate in the activities surrounding the 2016 U.S. Capitol Christmas tree, urging communities, businesses and schools throughout Idaho to contribute toward the effort to provide the U.S. Capitol Christmas tree, including involving organizations and schoolchildren in making ornaments for the tree, and urging Idahoans to participate in any community celebrations that may occur in their communities as the tree travels throughout Idaho prior to its trip across the United States to Washington, D.C.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and urging Idahoans to participate in the activities surrounding the 2016 U.S. Capitol Christmas tree, urging communities, businesses and schools throughout Idaho to contribute toward the effort to provide the U.S. Capitol Christmas tree, including involving organizations and schoolchildren in making ornaments for the tree, and urging Idahoans to participate in any community celebrations that may occur in their communities as the tree travels throughout Idaho prior to its trip across the United States to Washington, D.C.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:38 a.m. on March 24, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-21 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-18 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Read in full |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-03-03 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-03 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-03 | House | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2016-03-03 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Thursday, March 3, 2016 |
2016-02-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-26 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2016/HCR046.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2016/HCR046.pdf |