ID HCR043 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - to Health/Wel
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - to Health/Wel
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Department of Health and Welfare relating to Residential Habilitation Agencies.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Department of Health and Welfare relating to Residential Habilitation Agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-02-29 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-29 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-28 | to Senate | |
2012-02-28 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-28 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- 62-0-8 | |
2012-02-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-22 | to printing | |
2012-02-22 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-22 | House intro |