ID HCR034 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:31 a.m. on March 16, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:31 a.m. on March 16, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MINERS -- States findings of the Legislature and formally acknowledges the loss of all of Idaho's fallen miners and declares every May 2 Miners Memorial Day.
Title
States findings of the Legislature and formally acknowledges the loss of all of Idaho's fallen miners and declares every May 2 Miners Memorial Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:31 a.m. on March 16, 2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-15 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2022-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-02-23 | House | to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Title apvd |
2022-02-23 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2022-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |