ID HCR025 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:07 a.m. on February 18, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:07 a.m. on February 18, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CHICKEN DINNER ROAD -- Stating findings of the Legislature and affirming the historical value of the designation of Chicken Dinner Road in Canyon County, Idaho.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and affirming the historical value of the designation of Chicken Dinner Road in Canyon County, Idaho.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:07 a.m. on February 18, 2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-02-13 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-02-12 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-01-27 | House | to Senate |
2020-01-27 | House | Title apvd |
2020-01-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2020-01-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 27, 2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/HCR025/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/HCR025.pdf |