ID HCR020 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ENDOWMENT LAND USE -- Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting the Department of Lands to produce a report detailing the managed uses of state endowment land.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting the Department of Lands to produce a report detailing the managed uses of state endowment land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Reconsidered -- FAILED 23-46-1 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | motion carried |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Motion to reconsider |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Held at Desk |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Notice to reconsider |
2017-03-06 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 43-26-1 |
2017-03-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-27 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2017-02-24 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |