ID HCR007 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:26 a.m. on March 13, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:26 a.m. on March 13, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a rulemaking docket of the Idaho Transportation Department relating to rules governing license plate provisions.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a rulemaking docket of the Idaho Transportation Department relating to rules governing license plate provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:26 a.m. on March 13, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-03-11 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-08 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-07 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read in full |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-02-22 | House | to Senate |
2013-02-22 | House | Title apvd |
2013-02-22 | House | ADOPTED -- 63-0-7 |
2013-02-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-02-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2013-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |