ID HCR002 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:20 a.m. on February 8, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDDIE YEN -- Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring Director Eddie Yen on his thirtieth anniversary as Idaho's Asia Trade Representative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring Director Eddie Yen on his thirtieth anniversary as Idaho's Asia Trade Representative.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 11:20 a.m. on February 8, 2019
2019-02-08HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2019-02-07SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-02-07SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-02-06HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-05HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-02-04Senateto House
2019-02-04SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-04SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-01-31SenateRetained on calendar
2019-01-30SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2019-01-16SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-01-15Houseto Senate
2019-01-15HouseTitle apvd
2019-01-15HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-01-14HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-11HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback