ID H0747 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - March 31, 2022 Session Law Chapter 326 Effective: 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - March 31, 2022 Session Law Chapter 326 Effective: 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE ELECTIVE OFFICERS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the salaries of state elective officials.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the salaries of state elective officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | House | March 31, 2022 Session Law Chapter 326 Effective: 01/01/2023 |
2022-03-25 | House | Law without signature |
2022-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:25 p.m. on March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2022-03-23 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-08 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-08 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |