ID H0728 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2022 Session Law Chapter 309 Effective: 03/29/2022; 03/01/2023 Sunset Clause
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2022 Session Law Chapter 309 Effective: 03/29/2022; 03/01/2023 Sunset Clause
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
PERSI -- Adds to existing law to provide for the divestment of certain assets related to Russia.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for the divestment of certain assets related to Russia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2022 Session Law Chapter 309 Effective: 03/29/2022; 03/01/2023 Sunset Clause |
2022-03-24 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-22 | House | to enrol |
2022-03-22 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-22 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-22 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2022-03-21 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2022-03-21 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2022-03-21 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2022-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 31-0-4 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-08 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-08 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |