ID H0720 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 31, 2022 Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 31, 2022 Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PERSONHOOD -- Adds to existing law to provide that environmental elements, artificial intelligence, nonhuman animals, and inanimate objects shall not be granted personhood.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that environmental elements, artificial intelligence, nonhuman animals, and inanimate objects shall not be granted personhood.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 31, 2022 Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 07/01/2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:25 p.m. on March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2022-03-23 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 30-5-0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-03 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |