ID H0691 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 334 Effective: 04-05-12 Section 2 for all approved and valid special use permits; 07-01-12 Section 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 334 Effective: 04-05-12 Section 2 for all approved and valid special use permits; 07-01-12 Section 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to special use permits, conditions and procedures to revise provisions relating to notice; and to establish provisions relating to exceptions or waivers of certain standards.
Title
Amends existing law relating to special use permits, conditions and procedures to revise provisions relating to notice; and to establish provisions relating to exceptions or waivers of certain standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 334 Effective: 04-05-12 Section 2 for all approved and valid special use permits; 07-01-12 Section 1 | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/30 | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-29 | To enrol | |
2012-03-28 | to House | |
2012-03-28 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-28 | Corder | |
2012-03-28 | 31-3-1 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lodge, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Pearce, Rice, Siddoway, Smyser, Tippets, Toryanski, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- LeFavour, Malepeai, Stennett Absent and excused -- Schmidt Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-28 | PASSED | |
2012-03-28 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-28 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-28 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-23 | to Loc Gov | |
2012-03-23 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-23 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-22 | to Senate | |
2012-03-22 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-22 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 59-10-1 | |
2012-03-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-20 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-20 | to Loc Gov | |
2012-03-20 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-19 | to printing | |
2012-03-19 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-19 | House intro |