ID H0658 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - March 28, 2018 Session Law Chapter 350 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

PROPERTY -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for civil trespass, criminal trespass and recreational trespass, and to limit the liability of a landowner to a trespasser.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide for civil trespass, criminal trespass and recreational trespass, and to limit the liability of a landowner to a trespasser.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23HouseMarch 28, 2018 Session Law Chapter 350 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-23HouseLaw without signature
2018-03-23HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:18 p.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-22Houseto enrol
2018-03-22HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-22HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-22HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-21HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-21HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2018-03-21HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2018-03-21HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2018-03-21HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence; objection
2018-03-21HouseReferred to Agricultural Affairs for concurrence recommendation
2018-03-21HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2018-03-21Senateto House
2018-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-21SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 29-6-0
2018-03-21SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-21SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2018-03-20SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-20SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-03-20SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2018-03-20SenateAmendments ordered printed
2018-03-20SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-03-15SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2018-03-13SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-12Houseto Senate
2018-03-12HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-12HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 45-22-3
2018-03-09HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-08HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-07HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-02HouseReported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs
2018-03-01HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback