ID H0653 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 284 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 284 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Child Protective Act to revise provisions relating to the duties of a guardian ad litem.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Child Protective Act to revise provisions relating to the duties of a guardian ad litem.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 284 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-29 | To enrol | |
2010-03-26 | to House | |
2010-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-26 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2010-03-25 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-25 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-25 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-25 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-22 | to Health/Wel | |
2010-03-22 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-22 | Senate intro | |
2010-03-19 | to Senate | |
2010-03-19 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-19 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 60-0-10 | |
2010-03-18 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-18 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-17 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-17 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-17 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-11 | to Health/Wel | |
2010-03-11 | Rpt prt | |
2010-03-10 | to printing | |
2010-03-10 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-10 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0653.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0653.pdf |