ID H0646 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 356 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 356 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - CONSERVATION EASEMENT - Appropriates an additional $5,000,000 to the Department of Lands for fiscal year 2017; provides fiscal year 2016 reappropriation for the Forest Legacy Program; appropriates an additional $2,000,000 to the Department of Fish and Game for fiscal year 2017; and provides legislative intent.
Title
Appropriates an additional $5,000,000 to the Department of Lands for fiscal year 2017; provides fiscal year 2016 reappropriation for the Forest Legacy Program; appropriates an additional $2,000,000 to the Department of Fish and Game for fiscal year 2017; and provides legislative intent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 356 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 28, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-25 | House | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-25 | House | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-24 | House | to House |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | Johnson |
2016-03-24 | House | 22-11-2 AYES -- Bair, Brackett, Rohn(Buckner-Webb), Burgoyne, Davis, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Nonini, Patrick, Schmidt, Souza, Stennett, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- Anthon, Bayer, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Rice, Siddoway, Thayn Absent and excused -- Heider, Hill Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | House | Read in full as required) |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2016-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Johnson |
2016-03-24 | Senate | 22-11-2 AYES -- Bair, Brackett, Rohn(Buckner-Webb), Burgoyne, Davis, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Nonini, Patrick, Schmidt, Souza, Stennett, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- Anthon, Bayer, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Rice, Siddoway, Thayn Absent and excused -- Heider, Hill Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | Burtenshaw |
2016-03-24 | House | 48-21-1 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Bateman, Bell, Beyeler, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Chew, Clow, Collins, Dayley, Erpelding, Gannon, Gibbs, Hartgen, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nye, Packer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, VanOrden, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Andrus, Batt, Boyle, Cheatham, Crane, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Gestrin, Harris, Hixon, Luker, McMillan, Mendive, Nate, Nielsen, Palmer, Redman, Scott, Shepherd, Trujillo, Vander Woude Absent -- Barbieri Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2016-03-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |