ID H0643 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2014 Session Law Chapter 332 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2014 Session Law Chapter 332 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $16,803,500 for the Educational Support Program/Division of Central Services for fiscal year 2015; provides for personnel costs to administer the safe and drug-free schools program; expenditures for math, reading, and remediation services; personnel for the limited English proficiency program; for college entrance exams; for end-of-course exams; for wireless technology services; for administration of teacher evaluation training; an instructional management system; professional development; for information technology opportunities; and for intent on the use of funds.
Title
Appropriates $16,803,500 for the Educational Support Program/Division of Central Services for fiscal year 2015; provides for personnel costs to administer the safe and drug-free schools program; expenditures for math, reading, and remediation services; personnel for the limited English proficiency program; for college entrance exams; for end-of-course exams; for wireless technology services; for administration of teacher evaluation training; an instructional management system; professional development; for information technology opportunities; and for intent on the use of funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2014 Session Law Chapter 332 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on March 24, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Cameron |
2014-03-20 | Senate | 29-5-1 AYES -- Bair, Bock, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Thayn, Tippets, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- Bayer, Fulcher, Nuxoll, Pearce, Vick Absent and excused -- Stennett Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-03-19 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-19 | House | Thompson |
2014-03-19 | House | 58-10-2 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Bell, Bolz, Chew, Clow, Collins, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Shepherd, Smith, Stevenson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Barrett, Batt, Boyle, Burgoyne, Crane, Harris, McMillan, Palmer, Sims Absent -- Kloc, Thompson Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-19 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-19 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 3, read three times |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |