ID H0639 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BOND ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to provide that a taxing district may not run another bond election for eleven months after a failed bond election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that a taxing district may not run another bond election for eleven months after a failed bond election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-02SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-03-02SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-01Houseto Senate
2018-03-01HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-01HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 37-32-1
2018-02-28HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-27HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-26HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback