ID H0639 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 328 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 328 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to contracts to revise provisions relating to limitations on the right to sue under contract and to provide application to arbitration.
Title
Amends existing law relating to contracts to revise provisions relating to limitations on the right to sue under contract and to provide application to arbitration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 328 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/30 | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-29 | To enrol | |
2012-03-28 | to House | |
2012-03-28 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-28 | Davis | |
2012-03-28 | 34-0-1 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Pearce, Rice, Siddoway, Smyser, Stennett, Tippets, Toryanski, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Schmidt Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-28 | PASSED | |
2012-03-28 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-28 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-28 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-21 | to Jud | |
2012-03-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-21 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-20 | to Senate | |
2012-03-20 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-20 | Luker | |
2012-03-20 | 68-0-2 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block(Block), Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Higgins, Lake Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-20 | PASSED | |
2012-03-20 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-20 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-20 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-19 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-19 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt engros | |
2012-03-19 | to engros | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-03-14 | to Gen Ord | |
2012-03-14 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-07 | to Jud | |
2012-03-07 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-06 | to printing | |
2012-03-06 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-06 | House intro |