ID H0637 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 353 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 353 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITIES - Appropriates $556,135,800 to the State Board of Education and the Board of Regents of the University of Idaho for college and universities and the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2017; provides certain reappropriation authority; provides legislative intent for systemwide needs; provides legislative intent for the Complete College Idaho initiative; provides legislative intent for a cybersecurity lab in conjunction with the Idaho National Lab; and exempts appropriation object and program transfer limitations.
Title
Appropriates $556,135,800 to the State Board of Education and the Board of Regents of the University of Idaho for college and universities and the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2017; provides certain reappropriation authority; provides legislative intent for systemwide needs; provides legislative intent for the Complete College Idaho initiative; provides legislative intent for a cybersecurity lab in conjunction with the Idaho National Lab; and exempts appropriation object and program transfer limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 353 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 28, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-25 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-25 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Mortimer |
2016-03-24 | Senate | 34-1-0 AYES -- Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Rohn(Buckner-Webb), Burgoyne, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- Nuxoll Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | Horman |
2016-03-24 | House | 56-14-0 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Bell, Beyeler, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hartgen, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Shepherd, Smith, Thompson, Troy, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Boyle, Crane, Harris, Hixon, Loertscher, McMillan, Moyle, Palmer, Scott, Sims, Trujillo Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2016-03-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |