ID H0637 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 172 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 172 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $18,725,400 to the Attorney General for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 193.6; exempts the Attorney General from object and program transfer limitations; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Title
Appropriates $18,725,400 to the Attorney General for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 193.6; exempts the Attorney General from object and program transfer limitations; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 172 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-23 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/22 | |
2012-03-22 | To Governor | |
2012-03-21 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-21 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-21 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-20 | To enrol | |
2012-03-19 | to House | |
2012-03-19 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-19 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-03-14 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-14 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-13 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-12 | to Fin | |
2012-03-12 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-12 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-09 | to Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-09 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 49-18-3 | |
2012-03-08 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-06 | to printing | |
2012-03-06 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-06 | House intro |