ID H0627 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 350 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 350 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION - Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding leadership premiums.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding leadership premiums.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 350 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 28, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Den Hartog |
2016-03-24 | Senate | 27-8-0 AYES -- Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Keough, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Siddoway, Souza, Thayn, Vick, Winder NAYS -- Rohn(Buckner-Webb), Burgoyne, Johnson, Jordan, Lacey, Schmidt, Stennett, Ward-Engelking Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-03-23 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-23 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-23 | House | VanOrden |
2016-03-23 | House | 46-22-2 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Cheatham, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Kerby, Loertscher, Luker, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Romrell, Shepherd, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Chaney, Chew, Erpelding, Gannon, Hartgen, Jordan, King, Kloc, McCrostie, McMillan, Moyle, Nate, Nye, Pence, Redman, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Sims, Smith, Wintrow Absent -- Malek, Rubel Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-23 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-23 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 65 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 5, read three times |
2016-03-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-21 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2016-03-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |