ID H0624 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - SECTION 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - SECTION 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding a review of teacher evaluations, to provide that certain data shall be submitted to the state for career ladder purposes, and to provide that master educator premiums shall no longer be granted after a certain date.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding a review of teacher evaluations, to provide that certain data shall be submitted to the state for career ladder purposes, and to provide that master educator premiums shall no longer be granted after a certain date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | House | SECTION 4 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2020 Session Law Chapter 272 Effective: 07/01/2020; 07/01/2024 Sunset Clause |
2020-03-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-03-16 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-16 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2020-03-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to Education |
2020-03-11 | House | Reported Printed and Held at Desk |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |