ID H0621 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Reported out of Committee and referred to: Resources & Environment
Pending: Senate Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Reported out of Committee and referred to: Resources & Environment
Pending: Senate Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SURVEYORS -- Amends existing law to provide procedures for access to private land for a professional land surveyor.
Title
Amends existing law to provide procedures for access to private land for a professional land surveyor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported out of Committee and referred to: Resources & Environment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-03-05 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-05 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |