ID H0619 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 214 Effective: 03/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 214 Effective: 03/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law to provide for a petition for highway maintenance, to provide requirements, to provide duties of the Idaho Transportation Board and the Idaho Transportation Department, to provide for a hearing upon certain circumstances, to provide the effect of granting or denying a petition, to provide for termination or modification of a granted petition and to provide the effect of an action regarding the granting or denial of a petition.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law to provide for a petition for highway maintenance, to provide requirements, to provide duties of the Idaho Transportation Board and the Idaho Transportation Department, to provide for a hearing upon certain circumstances, to provide the effect of granting or denying a petition, to provide for termination or modification of a granted petition and to provide the effect of an action regarding the granting or denial of a petition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 214 Effective: 03/26/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:50 p.m. on March 20, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Brackett |
2014-03-19 | Senate | 23-11-1 AYES -- Bock, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Goedde, Hagedorn, Heider, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, Nonini, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Stennett, Tippets, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- Bair, Bayer, Fulcher, Guthrie, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Pearce, Siddoway, Thayn, Vick Absent and excused -- Hill Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-19 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-14 | House | Palmer |
2014-03-14 | House | 52-13-5 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barrett, Bell, Bolz, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Bateman, Batt, Boyle, Denney, Gestrin, Hixon, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Nielsen, Shepherd, Sims Absent -- Barbieri, Henderson, Meline, Rusche, Wood(35) Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-14 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 61 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 9, read three times |
2014-03-14 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2014-03-14 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2014-03-14 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2014-03-14 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-14 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2014-03-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |