ID H0607 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 217 Effective: 04/03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 217 Effective: 04/03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Public Employee Retirement System to revise provisions relating to those that do not meet the definition of "employee."
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Public Employee Retirement System to revise provisions relating to those that do not meet the definition of "employee."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 217 Effective: 04/03/12 | |
2012-03-27 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/26 | |
2012-03-26 | To Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-23 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-23 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-22 | To enrol | |
2012-03-21 | to House | |
2012-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-03-19 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-19 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-12 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-03-12 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-12 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-09 | to Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-09 | Stevenson | |
2012-03-09 | 65-0-5 AYES -- Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block(Block), Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood(DeVries), Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Thayn, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35) NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Anderson, Bedke, McGeachin, Thompson, Mr. Speaker Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-09 | PASSED | |
2012-03-09 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-08 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-01 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-29 | to printing | |
2012-02-29 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-29 | House intro |