ID H0603 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - U.C. to be returned to Resources & Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

STOCKWATER RIGHTS -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide legislative intent regarding certain stockwater rights; to provide for the forfeiture of certain stockwater rights and to provide a procedure; and to clarify that if any agency of the federal government acquires a stockwater right, that right shall never be utilized for any purpose other than watering of livestock unless otherwise approved by the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide legislative intent regarding certain stockwater rights; to provide for the forfeiture of certain stockwater rights and to provide a procedure; and to clarify that if any agency of the federal government acquires a stockwater right, that right shall never be utilized for any purpose other than watering of livestock unless otherwise approved by the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseU.C. to be returned to Resources & Conservation Committee
2018-03-20HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-19HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-19HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2018-03-16HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2018-03-16HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence
2018-03-13HouseReferred to Resources & Conservation for concurrence recommendation
2018-03-13HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2018-03-12Senateto House
2018-03-12SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-12SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-03-12SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-12SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2018-03-09SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-09SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-03-08SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2018-03-08SenateAmendments ordered printed
2018-03-08SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-03-05SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2018-02-27SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-26Houseto Senate
2018-02-26HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-26HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3
2018-02-22HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-22HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-16HouseReported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
2018-02-15HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback