ID H0594 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise the maximum amount of a homestead that may be exempt from taxation and to delete adjustments to reflect the cost of living fluctuations.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the maximum amount of a homestead that may be exempt from taxation and to delete adjustments to reflect the cost of living fluctuations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-03-10 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-10 | House | Trujillo |
2014-03-10 | House | 54-16-0 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Clow, Collins, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Romrell, Shepherd, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Burgoyne, Chew, Crane, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, King, Kloc, McMillan, Pence, Ringo, Rubel, Rusche, Sims, Smith, Woodings Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-10 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2014-03-07 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2014-03-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |