ID H0585 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FIREARMS -- Amends existing law to prohibit certain actions involving a firearm and persons convicted of domestic violence and to provide a penalty.
Title
Amends existing law to prohibit certain actions involving a firearm and persons convicted of domestic violence and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2018-03-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 31-39-0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |