ID H0564 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2016 Session Law Chapter 243 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2016 Session Law Chapter 243 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - OFFICE OF SPECIES CONSERVATION - Appropriates $13,878,400 to the Office of Species Conservation for fiscal year 2017; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 12.63; and expresses legislative intent with regard to sage-grouse conservation actions.
Title
Appropriates $13,878,400 to the Office of Species Conservation for fiscal year 2017; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 12.63; and expresses legislative intent with regard to sage-grouse conservation actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2016 Session Law Chapter 243 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:36 p.m. on March 24, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-21 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-17 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-03-08 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-08 | House | PASSED -- 59-11-0 |
2016-03-08 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |