ID H0546 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 3, 2014 Session Law Chapter 336 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 3, 2014 Session Law Chapter 336 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to provide for the Idaho Reimbursement Incentive Act and to provide for reimbursement to businesses for job creation from certain tax dollars.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for the Idaho Reimbursement Incentive Act and to provide for reimbursement to businesses for job creation from certain tax dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported Signed by Governor on April 3, 2014 Session Law Chapter 336 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on March 24, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-20 | House | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | to enrol |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Moyle |
2014-03-20 | Senate | 61-7-2 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Kloc, Loertscher, Malek, McDonald, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rusche, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barrett, Harris, Luker, McMillan, Nielsen, Shepherd, Sims Absent -- King, Rubel Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended: Ayes 68 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 2, read three times |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2014-03-19 | Senate | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2014-03-19 | House | to House |
2014-03-19 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-19 | House | Rice |
2014-03-19 | House | 28-6-1 AYES -- Bair, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Tippets, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- Bayer, Fulcher, Johnson, Nuxoll, Thayn, Vick Absent and excused -- Bock Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-19 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-19 | House | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-19 | House | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-19 | House | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Amendments reported printed |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Amendments ordered printed |
2014-03-18 | House | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2014-03-18 | House | UC to reconsider |
2014-03-17 | House | Held for reconsideration |
2014-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-17 | Senate | PASSED -- 29-6-0 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-03-04 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-04 | House | Moyle & Anderst |
2014-03-04 | House | 63-5-2 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barrett, Harris, McMillan, Shepherd, Sims Absent -- Anderson(01), Nielsen Floor Sponsors |
2014-03-04 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-04 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 3, read three times |
2014-03-04 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-03 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2014-02-24 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |