ID H0545 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
WINE -- Amends existing law to provide for personalized labels and customized private labels under certain conditions.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for personalized labels and customized private labels under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-03-12 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-12 | House | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 62-0-8 |
2018-03-09 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2018-03-07 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2018-03-07 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-23 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2018-02-22 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2018-02-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2018-02-12 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |