ID H0523 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2020 Session Law Chapter Effective:
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to provide for an advanced professional endorsement for school personnel and to increase career ladder allocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for an advanced professional endorsement for school personnel and to increase career ladder allocations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2020 Session Law Chapter Effective:
2020-03-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on March 19, 2020
2020-03-19HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2020-03-19SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2020-03-19SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2020-03-18HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2020-03-18HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2020-03-18Senateto House
2020-03-18SenateTitle apvd
2020-03-18SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 30-1-4
2020-03-16SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-03-13SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-03-03SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Education
2020-03-03SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2020-02-28Houseto Senate
2020-02-28HouseTitle apvd
2020-02-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 52-10-8
2020-02-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-02-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-02-20HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2020-02-19HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback