ID H0521 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 346 Effective: 07/01/2016; 06/30/2019 Sunset Clause
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 346 Effective: 07/01/2016; 06/30/2019 Sunset Clause
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ALCOHOL - Adds to existing law to provide limited use immunity to a minor who acts in good faith and for a medical emergency, to provide requirements and to allow prosecution for other charges.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide limited use immunity to a minor who acts in good faith and for a medical emergency, to provide requirements and to allow prosecution for other charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2016 Session Law Chapter 346 Effective: 07/01/2016; 06/30/2019 Sunset Clause |
2016-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 28, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-25 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | to enrol |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | Troy |
2016-03-24 | House | 67-0-3 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent -- Bateman, Kloc, Rubel Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 64 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 6, read three times |
2016-03-24 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2016-03-22 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2016-03-22 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2016-03-22 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2016-03-21 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-21 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-03-07 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-07 | House | PASSED -- 65-5-0 |
2016-03-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 7, 2016 |
2016-03-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration |
2016-02-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |