ID H0514 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
Pending: Senate Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
Pending: Senate Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FISH AND GAME COMMISSION -- Amends existing law to remove provisions regarding political party affiliation.
Title
Amends existing law to remove provisions regarding political party affiliation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-28 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 48-13-9 |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |