ID H0512 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 117 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 117 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and repeals existing law relating to sheep to change the name of the Idaho Sheep Commission to the Idaho Sheep and Goat Health Board, to remove a requirement for approval of the Governor relating to the board's appointment of a veterinarian; to revise assessment provisions; to provide for an assessment on goats; to remove provisions relating to the deposit of certain moneys and the withdrawal of moneys; and to remove audit provisions and exemption provisions related to standard travel and pay allowances for specified expenditures.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law relating to sheep to change the name of the Idaho Sheep Commission to the Idaho Sheep and Goat Health Board, to remove a requirement for approval of the Governor relating to the board's appointment of a veterinarian; to revise assessment provisions; to provide for an assessment on goats; to remove provisions relating to the deposit of certain moneys and the withdrawal of moneys; and to remove audit provisions and exemption provisions related to standard travel and pay allowances for specified expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 117 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/21 | |
2012-03-21 | To Governor | |
2012-03-20 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-19 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-16 | To enrol | |
2012-03-15 | to House | |
2012-03-15 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-15 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2012-03-08 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-07 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-01 | to Agric Aff | |
2012-03-01 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-01 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-29 | to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-29 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 57-8-5 | |
2012-02-28 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-28 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-27 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-27 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-27 | Rpt engros | |
2012-02-24 | to engros | |
2012-02-24 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-02-23 | to Gen Ord | |
2012-02-23 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-10 | to Agric Aff | |
2012-02-10 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-09 | to printing | |
2012-02-09 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-09 | House intro |