ID H0500 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2020 Session Law Chapter 333 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

FAIRNESS IN WOMEN'S SPORTS ACT -- Adds to existing law to establish the Fairness in Women's Sports Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to establish the Fairness in Women's Sports Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2020 Session Law Chapter 333 Effective: 07/01/2020
2020-03-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 8:19 p.m. on March 18, 2020
2020-03-18HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2020-03-18SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2020-03-18HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2020-03-18Houseto enrol
2020-03-18HouseTitle apvd
2020-03-18HouseRules Suspended:
2020-03-18HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2020-03-17HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-17HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2020-03-17HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2020-03-17HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2020-03-17HouseReturned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk
2020-03-16Senateto House
2020-03-16SenateTitle apvd
2020-03-16SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 24-11-0
2020-03-16SenateRetained on calendar
2020-03-12SenateRetained on calendar
2020-03-11SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2020-03-10SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-10SenateAmendments reported printed
2020-03-10SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2020-03-10SenateAmendments ordered printed
2020-03-10SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2020-03-09SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2020-02-27SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2020-02-26Houseto Senate
2020-02-26HouseTitle apvd
2020-02-26HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 52-17-1
2020-02-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2020-02-24HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-02-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-02-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2020-02-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback