ID H0491 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2024 Session Law Chapter 100 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2024 Session Law Chapter 100 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MUNICIPAL CORPORATIONS -- Amends existing law to provide that certain notice may be given by first class or certified mail and to provide for proof of mailing.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that certain notice may be given by first class or certified mail and to provide for proof of mailing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2024 Session Law Chapter 100 Effective: 07/01/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:45 a.m. on March 19, 2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-03-18 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-03-15 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2024-03-14 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-1-1 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-02-20 | House | to Senate |
2024-02-20 | House | Title apvd |
2024-02-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2024-02-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-02-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Local Government |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |