ID H0491 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 242 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 242 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise the definition of snowmobile; and to revise provisions giving counties the option of allowing the use of groomed snowmobile trails by snowmobiles and such other vehicles as the county may allow.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the definition of snowmobile; and to revise provisions giving counties the option of allowing the use of groomed snowmobile trails by snowmobiles and such other vehicles as the county may allow.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 242 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:30 p.m. on March 19, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-18 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-18 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-02-26 | House | to Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Title apvd |
2014-02-26 | House | PASSED -- 68-0-2 |
2014-02-26 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-02-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-02-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-12 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |