ID H0487 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BOND AND LEVY ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to provide that a taxing district may not run another bond or levy election for twelve months after a failed bond or levy election.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a taxing district may not run another bond or levy election for twelve months after a failed bond or levy election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported out without amendments; filed for second reading |
2018-02-16 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/H0487/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/H0487.pdf |